Trustees ALLEN'S CROSS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Teresa Hussey Chair 30 September 2022
None on record
Sylvia Stanway Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Emily Pugh Trustee 17 November 2024
None on record
Rev Theresa Morton Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Stephen Clark Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record