Trustees SUTTON COLDFIELD UNIT 42 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 523023

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Smith | Chair | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Thomas Paul Owen | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Anat Kanengisser | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma Salter | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Natasha Jeynes | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Balraj Bhopal | Trustee | 23 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Ganley | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Joshua Walsh | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.