Accounts and annual returns THE MUSGRAVE PARISH INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 523071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 08 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 02 September 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required