Accounts and annual returns STOCK AND BRADLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required