Financial history EAST HARLSEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £23.23k £47.45k £47.39k £42.24k £51.14k
Total expenditure £14.23k £43.23k £54.56k £47.80k £37.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.43k N/A N/A N/A