Financial history STOCKTON-ON-TEES UNIT 319 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 523420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.61k £16.34k £15.00k £19.89k £20.85k
Total expenditure £12.17k £7.63k £17.77k £14.67k £15.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A