Governing document THE POPPLETON COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 523984

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 06/01/1998 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/2000 AS AMENDED ON 29/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 30/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2009
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE APB FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISHES OF UPPER POPPLETON AND NETHER POPPLETON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.