Financial history 5TH SKIPTON (PARISH CHURCH) GROUP - OF BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 524810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.90k £52.87k £32.87k £27.06k £14.89k
Total expenditure £105.91k £45.65k £28.36k £42.19k £15.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.93k £11.82k £5.00k N/A