Trustees 5TH SKIPTON (PARISH CHURCH) GROUP - OF BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 524810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mohammed Hossein Djavanroodi Chair 08 June 2023
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Williamson Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Carol Metcalfe Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Martin Williamson Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Katherine Helen Sorsby Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Catherine Mary Walton-Brown Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Euan David Hilton Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Gary Sorsby Trustee 10 November 2023
None on record
Jonathan Stubbs Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record