Financial history NORTH CESTRIAN GRAMMAR SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 525925
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019
Total gross income £2.26m £2.29m £2.98m £805 £1
Total expenditure £2.47m £4.51m £2.83m £29.25k £13.64k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £5.55k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £327.64k £315.40k £353.11k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.90m £1.97m £2.33m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £2.22k £1.76k £579 N/A N/A
Income - Other £25.06k £4.85k £284.35k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.47m £4.50m £2.47m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £9.62k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.74k £7.21k £11.21k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £345.74k N/A N/A