Financial history THE ASHTON BROTHERS SCHOLARSHIPS IN CONNEXION WITH HYDE COUNTY GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 526008
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £263 £459 £477 £378 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A