Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAM HIGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 528236
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2006 18 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 27 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 23 August 2006 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 30 June 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 28 July 2005 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 08 July 2005 8 days late