Financial history FREE METHODIST CHURCH OF PENWORTHAM

Charity Number: 701133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £100.10k £69.98k £67.47k £77.86k £76.41k
Total expenditure £96.36k £66.15k £61.85k £81.52k £75.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A