Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ELDON

Charity number: 702075
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 12 May 2009 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 06 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 30 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 13 June 2006 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required