Financial history RHYL ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702705
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/04/2011 14/04/2012 14/04/2013 14/04/2014 02/06/2015
Total gross income £6.04k £2.33k £51 £20 £0
Total expenditure £3.19k £3.70k £500 £0 £261
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A