Accounts and annual returns YORK LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 702776
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2015 08 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 07 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required