Financial history YORK LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 702776
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015
Total gross income £5.34k £3.88k £2.52k £2.07k £2.13k
Total expenditure £5.62k £2.64k £1.75k £2.43k £2.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A