Financial history DADLINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 702918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £13.08k £6.61k £5.01k £8.84k £9.66k
Total expenditure £9.81k £4.63k £2.51k £6.13k £7.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A