Trustees DADLINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 702918

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clair Bowen | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Buckby | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bowen | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Reid | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Reid | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Giles Setchell | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenis Kitely | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA JOHNSON | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ANNE JOAN REES-JONES | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP KITELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Simon Rees-Jones | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.