Financial history THE SHROPSHIRE THEATRE ORGAN TRUST

Charity Number: 702934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.97k £1.58k £5.18k £1.74k £720
Total expenditure £6.16k £1.55k £4.10k £5.88k £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A