Trustees THE SHROPSHIRE THEATRE ORGAN TRUST
Charity Number: 702934

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cameron John Lloyd | Chair | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Lobban | Trustee | 26 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole O'Ryan | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Griffiths | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alec Stewart Charles Walters | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Damon Willetts | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joy Roberts | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER HUGHES | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward David Hordley | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.