Accounts and annual returns ELMTREE AND FAIRFIELD WI

Charity number: 703180
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted