Financial history ELMTREE AND FAIRFIELD WI

Charity number: 703180
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2016
Total gross income £4.74k £4.50k £4.26k £3.21k £3.83k
Total expenditure £4.79k £4.32k £3.97k £4.26k £3.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A