Trustees BRITISH MEDICAL LASER ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 800062

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Vishal Madan | Chair | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Belba | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Reem Hanna | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raman Bhutani | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathy Fan | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Batchelor | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samira Batul Syed | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANJAYKUMAR M RAJPARA | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lister | Trustee | 08 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
VASANT HANSRAJ OSWAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HARRY MOSELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.