Accounts and annual returns THE TERTIUS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800121
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 08 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 10 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 25 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 28 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required