Financial history THE TERTIUS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800121
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £9.87k £12.44k £9.97k £7.40k £4.30k
Total expenditure £9.60k £14.45k £10.30k £5.42k £6.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A