Accounts and annual returns SOUTHWICK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 800799
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2016 27 March 2018 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 27 March 2018 208 days late
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 October 2016 On Time