Accounts and annual returns STOKE HILL PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity number: 800998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 December 2022 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 December 2022 167 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 August 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 August 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window