Accounts and annual returns THE HAYCORNS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 801146
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 July 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 July 2020 7 days late
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 15 May 2017 On Time