Financial history THE HAYCORNS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 801146
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £87.69k £100.40k £106.16k £121.82k £104.67k
Total expenditure £86.08k £91.58k £90.24k £110.86k £99.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £4.50k £4.00k £4.00k £3.75k