Financial history ST GILES TRUST

Charity number: 801355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.31m £14.93m £17.31m £18.89m £21.05m
Total expenditure £13.32m £13.72m £15.99m £19.79m £22.34m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.94m £3.69m £6.37m
Income from government grants £3.57m £4.79m £4.21m £9.16m £2.84m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.68m £3.30m £4.03m £4.99m £5.49m
Income - Other trading activities £108.74k £38.30k £92.99k £108.93k £129.31k
Income - Charitable activities £10.46m £11.57m £13.16m £13.65m £15.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £60.00k £23.28k £28.86k £137.76k £365.20k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £121.93k £0 £200.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.91m £13.25m £15.42m £18.96m £21.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £411.58k £472.20k £576.96k £829.32k £817.57k
Expenditure - Governance £18.81k £18.24k £20.33k £26.82k £33.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0