Financial history EAST GRINSTEAD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 801961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £19.55k £4.32k £22.70k £38.50k £37.98k
Total expenditure £16.52k £5.21k £28.48k £32.45k £33.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A