Trustees EAST GRINSTEAD CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 801961

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Cole | Chair | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Wilton | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Draper | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Anne Austin | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Margaret Moulsdale De Lang | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Walsh | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.