Financial history THE SIR JAMES BLACK SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 802012
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012
Total gross income £565 £211 £0 £0 £26
Total expenditure £2.04k £2.06k £1.20k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A