Financial history THE DISASTER RELIEF COMMUNICATIONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £21 £1 £2 £40 £84
Total expenditure £1.20k £0 £1.05k £3.44k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A