Accounts and annual returns SCULPTURE HOUSE

Charity Number: 802272
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 07 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 07 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 07 August 2011 20 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2011 Not Required