Financial history SCULPTURE HOUSE

Charity Number: 802272
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/08/2007 07/08/2008 07/08/2009 07/08/2010 07/08/2011
Total gross income £21.34k £20.11k £22.30k £21.17k £9.80k
Total expenditure £22.91k £21.69k £22.26k £21.28k £9.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A