Financial history EXTEND EXERCISE TRAINING LIMITED

Charity number: 802498
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022
Total gross income £47.24k £183.38k £46.65k £23.72k £28.35k
Total expenditure £103.16k £70.23k £133.00k £106.31k £94.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A