Accounts and annual returns THE KIDNEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802530
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 21 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 February 2008 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 22 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 07 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 February 2006 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 10 February 2006 10 days late