Financial history THE KIDNEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802530
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £2.75k £443 £1.30k £1.48k £626
Total expenditure £2.42k £485 £1.47k £352 £588
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A