Accounts and annual returns THE ARAB EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL FORUM

Charity number: 802735
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 August 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 August 2024 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 August 2024 402 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 August 2024 402 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 September 2020 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 16 September 2020 78 days late Download Open in new window