Financial history THE ARAB EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL FORUM

Charity Number: 802735
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £27.01k £53.94k £43.95k £66.00k £77.36k
Total expenditure £17.05k £53.58k £52.24k £75.12k £76.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A