Accounts and annual returns DORCHESTER-ON-THAMES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 900244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required