Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF HEATHERWOOD HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 900282
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 07 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 30 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 02 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required