Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF HEATHERWOOD HOSPITAL

Charity number: 900282
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £7.32k £7.81k £8.61k £9.43k £7.62k
Total expenditure £7.84k £12.04k £47.30k £10.77k £22.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A