Financial history ELWORTHY MONKSILVER AND NETTLECOMBE COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1018997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £10.09k £22.45k £16.66k £5.88k £8.77k
Total expenditure £8.98k £7.91k £8.18k £7.82k £10.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.61k £14.45k N/A N/A