Trustees ELWORTHY MONKSILVER AND NETTLECOMBE COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1018997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Freeman Chair 15 April 2025
None on record
Rosamund Mary Stace Trustee 15 April 2025
None on record
Gemma Jefferies Trustee 08 April 2024
None on record
Pamela Ann Xenia Young Trustee 08 April 2024
THE MINEHEAD AND DISTRICT U3A
Received: On time
Geraldine Goldsmith Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Joyce Bates Trustee 20 August 2019
None on record
Delia Brandwood Trustee 11 June 2016
None on record
SHIRLEY WALLACE Trustee
None on record