Financial history FELTON AND THIRSTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1053652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.32k £426 £2.35k £3.30k £1.80k
Total expenditure £821 £912 £1.43k £2.83k £1.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A