Trustees FELTON AND THIRSTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1053652

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Anne Thomas | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Althea Margaret Sowter | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Krzyzosiak | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Smith | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jackson | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Beddow | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.