Financial history CHICHESTER MEDICAL EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 244559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £176.59k £169.95k £112.44k £131.57k £468.60k
Total expenditure £112.99k £79.58k £81.94k £89.53k £114.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A